Rawls et al v. Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Justin Rawls
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, ., American Stump & Tree Service, Inc., Stephan J. Szoke and Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01566
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(Evans, Beth)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court by American Stump & Tree Service, Inc., Stephan J. Szoke (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Youssef, Matthew)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Youssef on behalf of American Stump & Tree Service, Inc., Stephan J. Szoke (Youssef, Matthew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Status Report Submitted Jointly on behalf of all parties by American Stump & Tree Service, Inc., Stephan J. Szoke (Youssef, Matthew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(Evans, Beth)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(Evans, Beth)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Letter)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(Evans, Beth)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/29/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing #1 Notice of Removal by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Rawls. Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company served on 4/25/2019, answer due 6/24/2019.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 60 days as to Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against American Stump & Tree Service, Inc., Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Stephan J. Szoke filed by Justin Rawls.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-19-000667. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8036901), filed by Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in State Court Action, #2 Exhibit Civil Non-Domestic Case Information Report in State Court Action, #3 Exhibit Writ of Summons in State Court Action, #4 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittal in State Court Action, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evans, Beth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rawls et al v. Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Rawls
Represented By: Jonathan Evan Yoffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, .
Represented By: Beth Patricia Evans
Represented By: Lee H Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Stump & Tree Service, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephan J. Szoke
Represented By: Matthew James Youssef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Represented By: Beth Patricia Evans
Represented By: Lee H Ogburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?