Azille v. Wilson

Plaintiff: Peter F.T Azille
Defendant: Kevin Wilson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01629
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice, directing the Clerk to Close case. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/31/2019. (c/m 8/1/2019 heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 days to pay the full civil filing fee of $400 or to file a complete Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 6/10/2019. (c/m 6/10/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter F.T Azille(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin Wilson, filed by Peter F.T Azille. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Subpoeona, #4 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Azille v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter F.T Azille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?