Hassan v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Plaintiff: Ahmed A.A. Hassan
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01650
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Discovery)(bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Resurgent Capital Services, LP.(Whitelock, Julia)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/4/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE District Court for Baltimore City. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ahmed A.A. Hassan. Resurgent Capital Services, LP served on 5/8/2019, answer due 5/29/2019.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Resurgent Capital Services, LP.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services, LP, filed by Ahmed A.A. Hassan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Resurgent Capital Services, LP identifying Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Alegis-Group, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, LP.(Whitelock, Julia)
June 4, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Baltimore City, case number 10349-19. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8051858), filed by Resurgent Capital Services, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whitelock, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Represented By: Julia K Whitelock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmed A.A. Hassan
Represented By: Richard I Chaifetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?