Hendricks v. Cook et al

Plaintiff: Antoine Ronier Hendricks
Defendant: John S. Nugent, Marilyn Bentley and Takirah Cook
Case Number: 1:2019cv01674
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/31/2019. (c/m 7/31/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing plaintiff to provide supplemental information by 7/29/19. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/8/2019. (c/m and packet 7/9/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/8/2019. (c/m 7/9/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Marilyn Bentley, Takirah Cook, John S. Nugent, filed by Antoine Ronier Hendricks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Marilyn Bentley, Takirah Cook, John S. Nugent ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637115640.), filed by Antoine Ronier Hendricks. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendricks v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John S. Nugent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takirah Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine Ronier Hendricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?