International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland, Finishing Trades Institute and Political Action Together Fund
Defendant: United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01689
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/24/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Bryant on behalf of United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc. (Bryant, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zaslow, Levi)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Levi S Zaslow on behalf of United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc. (Zaslow, Levi)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Finishing Trades Institute, International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland, Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Political Action Together Fund (Sznyter, Judith)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8058605.), filed by International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund, Tim D. Maitland, Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative, Political Action Together Fund, Finishing Trades Institute. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Sznyter, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund et al v. United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters and Allied Trades Labor Management Cooperation Initiative
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Painters and Allied Trades Industry Pension Fund
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim D. Maitland
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Finishing Trades Institute
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Political Action Together Fund
Represented By: Judith Ann Sznyter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Glass & Panel Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Levi S Zaslow
Represented By: Matthew M Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?