Staples v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary Staples
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01697
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Consent MOTION to Stay re 7 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/29/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Stay re 7 Order on Motion to Stay by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.5 Certification of Filing of State Court Papers by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Lambert, Patricia) Modified on 7/2/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company State Court Affidavit-Service (Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company State Court Line to re-issue summons (Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company State Court Scheduling Order (Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company 2/22/2019 Summons (Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company State Court Civil Information Report (Lambert, Patricia)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company State Court Complaint/Petition (Lambert, Patricia)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Lambert, Patricia)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/14/2019.
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION to Stay Stay All Proceedings To Permit Exchange of Information and Allow The Parties To Attempt Resolution of This Matter by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/11/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Lambert, Patricia)
June 10, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HOWARD COUNTY. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Mary Staples.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company Statement of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Lambert, Patricia)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Howard County, case number C-13-CV-19-000203. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8062464), filed by Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 State Court Amended Complaint, #4 State Court Notice of Service)(Lambert, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staples v. Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Staples
Represented By: Damani K Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Kathryn Devan
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?