Baldwin v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kevin Baldwin
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01774
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin Baldwin (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing within 21 days from the date of this order, the Finance Officer at FCI Allenwood shall file an inmate accounty summary information sheet as therein set forth. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/24/2019. (c/m as directed 7/25/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin Baldwin (ol, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing Baldwin file either the $400.00 civil filing fee or an indigency motion by 7/17/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/26/2019. (c/m 6/26/19 as directed jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Return of Seized Property) against United States of America filed by Kevin Baldwin.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baldwin v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?