Hoogeveen v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leann Hoogeveen
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01779
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM (To include omitted page 2) (All THA Track Cases).. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Listing), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Listing))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER (All THA Track Cases) granting in part and denying in part (1173) Motion of Smith & Nephew to Dismiss in case 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(jnls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 8/6/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
August 5, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM (All THA Track Cases). Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/5/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/24/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 18. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/14/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/16/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 42. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Confirming results of the status conference call on July 16, 2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/18/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Leann Hoogeveen. Smith & Nephew, Inc. waiver sent on 6/18/2019, answer due 8/19/2019.(Rockstad, Trevor)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 14 Discovery and Trial Pool Process for BHR and THA Track Cases. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/26/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 62. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Confirming the dates set at the June 26, 2019 status conference. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listigns of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for June 26, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Reiskin, Terri)
June 18, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 1:17-md-02775-CCB. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8077426.), filed by Leann Hoogeveen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rockstad, Trevor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoogeveen v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Hoogeveen
Represented By: Trevor B Rockstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?