Fisher v. J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc.

Plaintiff: Barbara Fisher
Defendant: J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01793
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Spencer Saudek on behalf of J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc. (Saudek, Mark)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Barbara Fisher.(Glickson, Melanie)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MARGINAL ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (through August 9, 2019) by Barbara Fisher(Glickson, Melanie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc. (Dugan, Joseph)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dugan, Joseph)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Barbara Fisher. Barbara Fisher served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019.(Glickson, Melanie)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8079898.), filed by Barbara Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Glickson, Melanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Fisher
Represented By: Melanie Lisa Glickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.O. Spice and Cure Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph C Dugan
Represented By: Mark Spencer Saudek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?