Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company v. Carlyle et al
Plaintiff: Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Larry D Martin and Carvet E Carlyle
Case Number: 1:2019cv01796
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company. Carvet E Carlyle served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019.(Brault, James)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company (Brault, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Carvet E Carlyle and Larry D Martin. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 6/27/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Interpleader against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8080422.), filed by Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Variable Annuity Contract, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2-Variable Annuity Surrender Request, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3-Affidavit of Carvet Carlyle, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4-Ltr. to Carlyle & Martin-12-21-18, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5-Cover Ltr. to Carlyle & Martin-03-01-19, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons Summons to Carvet E. Carlyle, #8 Summons Summons to Larry D. Martin)(Brault, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company v. Carlyle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talcott Resolution Life Insurance Company
Represented By: James M Brault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carvet E Carlyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?