Nammack v. Hampstead Pre-Owned et al

Plaintiff: Arissa Nammack
Defendant: Pro Am Autos, LLC, Hampstead Pre-Owned and Anthony Birdsong
Case Number: 1:2019cv01798
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arissa Nammack. Hampstead Pre-Owned served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019; Pro Am Autos, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Anthony Birdsong, Hampstead Pre-Owned, Pro Am Autos, LLC.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff is Granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to provide service copies of the complaint, complete summonses, and Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/2/2019. (c/m 7/2/2019 with forms heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arissa Nammack(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Birdsong, Hampstead Pre-Owned, Pro Am Autos, LLC, filed by Arissa Nammack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Notice of Right To Sue)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nammack v. Hampstead Pre-Owned et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pro Am Autos, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hampstead Pre-Owned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arissa Nammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?