Desgraviers v. Planet Fitness

Plaintiff: Geraldine Desgraviers
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Case Number: 1:2019cv01817
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/12/2019. (c/m 8/12/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jnl, Deputy Clerk)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff 21 days to pay the full civil filing fee of $400. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/15/2019. (c/m 7/15/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Geraldine Desgraviers(krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Planet Fitness, filed by Geraldine Desgraviers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desgraviers v. Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Desgraviers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planet Fitness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?