McKenzie-El v. Ports of America et al
Plaintiff: Riker McKenzie-El
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Assocation, Local 333, AFL-CIO, Steamship Trade Association, Ports of America Baltimore, Inc, Ports of America, International Longshoremen's Association and Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2019cv01980
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Riker McKenzie-El re #1 Complaint Summons (Lewis, Dionna)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Quash Service of Process by Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- Summons, #3 Exhibit 2 - SDAT record, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 21 days as to International Longshoremen's Association, Ports of America, Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Riker McKenzie-El re #1 Complaint Summons (Lewis, Dionna)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #3 Notice (Other) filed by Riker McKenzie-El was filed incorrectly. **The name on the Summons to be serve does not match the names of the 3 defendants on the complaint. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 -[FILED IN ERROR]- NOTICE by Riker McKenzie-El re #1 Complaint Summons (Lewis, Dionna) Modified on 7/22/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Riker McKenzie-El was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Riker McKenzie-El(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8108540.), filed by Riker McKenzie-El. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Dionna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKenzie-El v. Ports of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riker McKenzie-El
Represented By: Dionna Maria Lewis, Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Assocation, Local 333, AFL-CIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steamship Trade Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ports of America Baltimore, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ports of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Longshoremen's Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steamship Trade Association of Baltimore
Represented By: Michael John Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?