Quansah v. Krewson
Plaintiff: James E Quansah
Defendant: Andrew M Krewson
Case Number: 1:2019cv01992
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING #11 Plaintiff's stipulation of dismissal with prejudice (c/e/m to K. Gephart 8/29/19 sat). Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 8/29/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
August 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION of Dismissal by James E Quansah(Weber, Paul)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Compliance by James D. Farrell, Motor Vehicle Administration.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James E Quansah. Andrew M Krewson served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Weber, Paul)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 6 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. James E Quansah must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Andrew M Krewson.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/9/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. James E Quansah or counsel for James E Quansah are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/23/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental to #1 Complaint filed by James E Quansah Summons - Defendant (Weber, Paul)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8110037.), filed by James E Quansah. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weber, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quansah v. Krewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Quansah
Represented By: Paul Joseph Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Krewson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?