Newcomb et al v. Babu et al
Plaintiff: Darrell S. Newcomb and Karen R. Newcomb
Defendant: Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Adanu Kidane, Charles Verghese, Admas, Inc., Refunds Plus, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Bella Batra, Chelsea M. Rebeck, CJC Financial, LLC, Elizabeth Pal, Bhupesh Babu, Beverly Branch, Nirav Babu and Matthew Herman
Case Number: 1:2019cv02046
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Meaghan Colleen Murphy on behalf of Elizabeth Pal (Murphy, Meaghan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 QC NOTICE: #12 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth Pal was filed incorrectly. **The appearance of Meaghan C. Murphy has not been entered. Please refile the notice of appearance using the log-in and password credentials for Meaghan C. Murphy. The notice has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Appearance by William Alexander Goldberg on behalf of Elizabeth Pal (Goldberg, William) Modified on 8/29/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Elizabeth Pal (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Goldberg, William)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Kurta. Directing attorney Jonathan Kurta to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marc Fitapelli. Directing attorney Marc Fitapelli to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 8/16/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan Kurta (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8175062.) by Darrell S. Newcomb(Rosen, Marc)
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Marc Fitapelli (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8175025.) by Darrell S. Newcomb(Rosen, Marc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Kane Hart on behalf of Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese (Hart, Ryan)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese's answers due on or before 10/4/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/7/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Answer or Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frenkel, Jacob) Modified on 8/7/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Shaye Frenkel on behalf of Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese (Frenkel, Jacob)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Elizabeth Pal, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Admas, Inc., Bhupesh Babu, Nirav Babu, Bella Batra, Beverly Branch, CJC Financial, LLC, DH Investments, LLC, Matthew Herman, Adanu Kidane, Elizabeth Pal, Chelsea M. Rebeck, Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C., Refunds Plus, LLC, Charles Verghese ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637116474.), filed by Karen R. Newcomb, Darrell S. Newcomb. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(krs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newcomb et al v. Babu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea M. Rebeck, J.D., P.C.
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adanu Kidane
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Verghese
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Admas, Inc.
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refunds Plus, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DH Investments, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Batra
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chelsea M. Rebeck
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJC Financial, LLC
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Pal
Represented By: William Alexander Goldberg
Represented By: Meaghan Colleen Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bhupesh Babu
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Branch
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nirav Babu
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Herman
Represented By: Jacob Shaye Frenkel
Represented By: Ryan Kane Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell S. Newcomb
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Represented By: Jonathan Kurta
Represented By: Marc Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen R. Newcomb
Represented By: Marc Seldin Rosen
Represented By: Jonathan Kurta
Represented By: Marc Fitapelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?