Herold v. Knight, et al.
Plaintiff: Frederick W. Herold, Jr.
Defendant: Bradford E Bugher, Julie A. Morrone, Carla Lynn Knight, Kristina Herold, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Jonathan D. Herold, Kristen H. Larimore, Allison P. Dickie and Bradford E. Bugher
Case Number: 1:2019cv02138
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Carla Lynn Knight's #24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Envelope)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Stafiej, Rosanne)
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc..(Stafiej, Rosanne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kristina Herold. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Hammock, Jesse)
August 29, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand and Supplement to Motion to Remand filed by Kristina Herold.(Hammock, Jesse)
August 26, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 25 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Frederick W. Herold, Jr (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss and Request for Hearing by Carla Lynn Knight (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lake, Shirlie)
August 23, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Bela Hammock on behalf of Kristina Herold (Hammock, Jesse)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand and Opposition to Supplement to Motion to Remand filed by Kristina Herold.(Cotter, Peter)
August 14, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand Supplement by Plaintiff filed by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Stafiej, Rosanne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #8 MOTION to Remand by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.(Stafiej, Rosanne)
August 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc..(Stafiej, Rosanne)
August 13, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Electronically by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Supplemental to #8 MOTION to Remand and Response to #9 Statement Regarding Removal filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 15 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Bradford E. Bugher, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Stafiej, Rosanne)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Frederick W. Herold, Jr (krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kristina Herold (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Cotter, Peter)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc..(Stafiej, Rosanne)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #3 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Stafiej, Rosanne)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Frederick W. Herold, Jr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Cover Letter)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mary H Tolbert. Directing attorney Mary H Tolbert to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 7/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc..(Stafiej, Rosanne)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 Removal Notification Letter mailed (7/23/2019-sls) (slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed - The Statement must be filed by 7/29/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mary H. Tolbert (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8137596.) by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.(Stafiej, Rosanne)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 7/22/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 The above document #2 is a copy of the filing in the Circuit Court for Baltimore County Maryland. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bradford E. Bugher, Allison P. Dickie, Jonathan D. Herold, Kristina Herold, Carla Lynn Knight, Kristen H. Larimore, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Julie A. Morrone (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Frederick W. Herold, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Lower Court Docket Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number C-03-CV-19-002058. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8135095), filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Stafiej, Rosanne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herold v. Knight, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford E Bugher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Morrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Lynn Knight
Represented By: Shirlie Norris Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristina Herold
Represented By: Peter R. Cotter, .
Represented By: Jesse Bela Hammock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Rosanne Elyse Stafiej
Represented By: Mary H Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Herold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen H. Larimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison P. Dickie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradford E. Bugher
Represented By: Rosanne Elyse Stafiej
Represented By: Mary H Tolbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W. Herold, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?