Johnson v. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Savon Johnson
Defendant: City Homes III Limited Partnership, Barry Mankowitz, City Homes, Inc. and Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02190
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 26 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by City Homes III Limited Partnership, City Homes, Inc..(Guttman, Zvi)
September 13, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint, by Barry Mankowitz.(Moore, John)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/11/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Strike Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Savon Johnson (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, Patrice)
September 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zvi Guttman on behalf of City Homes III Limited Partnership, City Homes, Inc. (Guttman, Zvi)
August 30, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Lambert, Patricia)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 QC NOTICE: #19 Response filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies - Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 19 -[FILED IN ERROR]- RESPONSE re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company.(Lambert, Patricia) Modified on 8/30/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Strike #14 Amended Complaint, or In the Alternative, MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Lambert, Patricia)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand filed by Savon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clarke, Patrice)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Savon Johnson's Complaint filed by Savon Johnson.(Clarke, Patrice)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephan Y Brennan on behalf of Savon Johnson (Brennan, Stephan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Savon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Blackline Version of First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 16 to First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 17 to First Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 18 to First Amended Complaint)(Clarke, Patrice)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Savon Johnson's Complaint by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Lambert, Patricia)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR- re-filed as ECF#13) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Savon Johnson's Complaint by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia) Modified on 8/2/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lambert, Patricia)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence re: Line Withdrawing PL Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (O Brien, Cara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Savon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit)(O Brien, Cara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Savon Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit3)(O Brien, Cara)
July 26, 2019 Telephone Conference re: TRO held on 7/26/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lambert, Patricia)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE SEE PAPER NO. 7] RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Lambert, Patricia) Modified on 7/26/2019 (chs, Deputy Clerk).
July 26, 2019 CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0416-8145776(Lambert, Patricia)
July 25, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 The case of Johnson v. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company et al, has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is CCB 19-cv-2190. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Savon Johnson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1A, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Text of Proposed Order)(bas, Deputy Clerk) .
July 25, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Savon Johnson(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Savon Johnson, filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Case Information Report)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.5(Lambert, Patricia)
July 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Lambert, Patricia)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-003739., filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 State Court Information Sheet, #4 State Court Cover Letter to Complaint, #5 Ex.1 to State Court Complaint, #6 Ex.2 to State Court Complaint, #7 Ex.3 to State Court Complaint, #8 Ex.4 to State Court Complaint, #9 Ex.5 to State Court Complaint, #10 Ex.6 to State Court Complaint, #11 Ex.7 to State Court Complaint, #12 Ex.8 to State Court Complaint, #13 Ex.9 to State Court Complaint, #14 Ex.10 to State Court Complaint, #15 Ex.11 to State Court Complaint, #16 Ex.12 to State Court Complaint, #17 Ex.13 to State Court Complaint, #18 Ex.14 to State Court Complaint, #19 Ex.15 to State Court Complaint, #20 Motion for TRO, #21 Memo in Support of TRO, #22 TRO Proposed Order, #23 TRO Ex.1, #24 TRO Ex.1A, #25 TRO Ex.2, #26 TRO Ex.3, #27 TRO Ex.4, #28 TRO Ex.5, #29 TRO Ex.6, #30 TRO Ex.7, #31 TRO Ex.8, #32 TRO Ex.9, #33 TRO Ex.10, #34 TRO Ex.11, #35 TRO Ex.12, #36 TRO Ex.13, #37 TRO Ex.14, #38 TRO Ex.15, #39 TRO Ex.16, #40 TRO Ex.17)(Lambert, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savon Johnson
Represented By: Matthew Brian Thompson
Represented By: Stephan Y Brennan
Represented By: Patrice Meredith Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Homes III Limited Partnership
Represented By: Zvi Guttman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Mankowitz
Represented By: John Marks Moore, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Zvi Guttman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Robert S Campbell
Represented By: Patricia McHugh Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?