Davis v. Baltimore City Community College et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davis, III
Defendant: Lt. Freddie Deeraffinreid, President Debra L. McCurdy, Cpl. James Wright, Baltimore City Community College, Sgt. Stuart Parker, Deputy Michel S. Stephen and Lt. Darryl C. Moore
Case Number: 1:2019cv02194
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #9 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/23/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Benjamin Davis to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Benjamin Davis files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/27/2019. (c/m 08/27/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/3/2019 (ol, Deputy Clerk).
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin Davis, III. All Defendants. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/12/2019. (c/m 8/12/19 ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Benjamin Davis, III or counsel for Benjamin Davis, III are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/26/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Benjamin Davis, III. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion of Plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to complete the USM forms and return to Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/1/2019. (c/m 8/1/19 as directed jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Davis, III.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baltimore City Community College, Freddie Deeraffinreid, Debra L. McCurdy, Darryl C. Moore, Stuart Parker, Michel S. Stephen and James Wright, filed by Benjamin Davis, III. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Baltimore City Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Freddie Deeraffinreid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Debra L. McCurdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. James Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore City Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Stuart Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Michel S. Stephen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Darryl C. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?