Becker et al v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Plaintiff: Timothy Becker and Karen Becker
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02201
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Listing), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Listing))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for September 25, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct (780 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Case Management Order, Proposed Second Revised CMO1 by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Revised CMO1)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 38. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/21/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 15. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Timothy Becker, Karen Becker. All Defendants.(Paikoff, Lawrence)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Confirming dates set at the conference held today. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 8/21/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Listing), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Listing))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
July 26, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8147115.), filed by Timothy Becker, Karen Becker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Paikoff, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker et al v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Becker
Represented By: Lawrence Paikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Becker
Represented By: Lawrence Paikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?