Barber Jcaim v. Burger King Corporation Headquarters et al
Plaintiff: Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim
Defendant: CR Properties Resturant, CR Restaurants, Burger King and Burger King Corporation Headquarters
Case Number: 1:2019cv02209
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 19-1998 for #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim - Case Manager - Michael Radday. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(slss, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case by Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim. (Fee Status: IFP)(rec'd for docketing from USCA on 9/12/2019-sls)(slss, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/12/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE; granting #2 Petition for Waiver of Cost. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/2/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 8.2.19)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Waiver of Cost by Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burger King, Burger King Corporation Headquarters, CR Properties Resturant, CR Restaurants, filed by Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim . (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber Jcaim v. Burger King Corporation Headquarters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Properties Resturant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Restaurants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Harley Barber Jcaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?