Hanson et al v. Hanson et al
Plaintiff: Marvia Hanson and Glen Hanson
Defendant: Kenneth Alfonso Hanson, Renae Denise Robinson and Rehans Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02214
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W Morris on behalf of All Defendants (Morris, Thomas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint, MOTION to Strike All Requests for Punitive Damages by Kenneth Alfonso Hanson, Rehans Logistics, Inc., Renae Denise Robinson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Morris, Thomas)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson. Rehans Logistics, Inc. served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(Evans, Karen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson. Renae Denise Robinson served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(Evans, Karen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson. Kenneth Alfonso Hanson served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019.(Evans, Karen)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: 8 Affidavit filed by Marvia Hanson, Glen Hanson, 7 Affidavit filed by Marvia Hanson, Glen Hanson, 9 Affidavit filed by Marvia Hanson, Glen Hanson were filed incorrectly. **Please refile documents by selecting Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Tracey L Brown. Attorney Tracey L Brown will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Derek S. Sells. Attorney Derek S. Sells will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 8/30/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tracey L. Brown (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8206523.) by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson(Evans, Karen)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Derek S. Sells (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8206502.) by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson(Evans, Karen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kenneth Alfonso Hanson, Renae Denise Robinson, Rehans Logistics, Inc. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Alfonso Hanson, Renae Denise Robinson, Rehans Logistics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8151425), filed by Glen Hanson, Marvia Hanson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Evans, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanson et al v. Hanson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvia Hanson
Represented By: Karen E Evans
Represented By: Derek S. Sells
Represented By: Tracey L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Hanson
Represented By: Karen E Evans
Represented By: Derek S. Sells
Represented By: Tracey L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Alfonso Hanson
Represented By: Thomas W Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renae Denise Robinson
Represented By: Thomas W Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rehans Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?