Monroe v. Saul
Plaintiff: Krystal J Monroe and Krystal Joy Monroe
Defendant: Andrew M. Sauls and Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2019cv02319
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/20/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/19/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to proceed before Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew M. Sauls (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Krystal J Monroe(Melanson, Theodore)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Sauls, filed by Krystal J Monroe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Melanson, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monroe v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Sauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal J Monroe
Represented By: Theodore Anthony Melanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Joy Monroe
Represented By: Theodore Anthony Melanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?