Internal Revenue Service v. Goff
Plaintiff: Internal Revenue Service
Defendant: Mary Claire Goff
Case Number: 1:2019cv02321
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:760
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 parties' Joint Motion for Entry of an Order to Enforce Summons. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/4/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION Entry of Order to Enforce Summons by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Neil Lapinski. Directing attorney Neil Lapinski to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 9/26/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neil R. Lapinski (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8254869.) by Mary Claire Goff(Euteneuer, Susan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Neil R. Lapinski re: No objection to enforcement of the Internal Revenue Service summons(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING: Show Cause Hearing rescheduled from October 16, 2019 to October 17, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 7A, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Judge George Levi Russell III. (dafs, Chambers)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition, Declaration, Order to Show Cause, etc. served on Mary Claire Goff on 09/06/2019, filed by Internal Revenue Service.(Kumar, Nishant)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Internal Revenue Service's Motion to Amend Petition to include a signed declaration. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/27/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons to include signed version of supporting declaration by Internal Revenue Service (Attachments: #1 Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kumar, Nishant)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/16/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons , filed by Internal Revenue Service. (Attachments: # WITHDRAWN-(1) Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kumar, Nishant) Modified on 8/27/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2019: #4 Signed Declaration of IRS Revenue Agent Kamri Murphy) (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internal Revenue Service v. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Claire Goff
Represented By: Neil Lapinski
Represented By: Susan Mae Euteneuer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Nishant Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?