Bunting Graphics, Inc. v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Plaintiff: Bunting Graphics, Inc.
Defendant: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02323
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/14/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Bunting Graphics, Inc. or counsel for Bunting Graphics, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/28/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 13, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bunting Graphics, Inc. (Windus, Robert)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8175420.), filed by Bunting Graphics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Subcontract, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Windus, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunting Graphics, Inc. v. The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Whiting-Turner Contracting Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bunting Graphics, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Dixon Windus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?