Martin v. Frosh
Petitioner: Steven Martin
Respondent: Brian Frosh and State of Maryland
Case Number: 1:2019cv02341
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Brian Frosh, State of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Docket Entries)(Jawor, Daniel)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Jawor on behalf of Brian Frosh, State of Maryland (Jawor, Daniel)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Supplemental to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Steven Martin summons (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCants, Kevin)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Respondents to file a response on or before 40 days. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/19/2019. (c/m & emailed 8/20/2019)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Case Assigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Supplemental to petition/complaint (McCants, Kevin)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0416-8179927.), filed by Steven Martin.(McCants, Kevin) Modified on 8/15/2019 (ko, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Frosh
Represented By: Daniel John Jawor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Maryland
Represented By: Daniel John Jawor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Martin
Represented By: Kevin Jesse McCants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?