Lester-Everett v. Greenwood et al
Plaintiff: i:man Lester-Everett
Defendant: Burton E. Greenwood, Jr. and Dorothy W. Greenwood
Case Number: 1:2019cv02356
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence by i:man Lester-Everett. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; dismissing complaint without prejudice; the clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 8/27/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-08-27-2019)
August 21, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of the Inability and the Impossibility of "Prepaying" Fees or Costs by i:man Lester-Everett. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of the Claim of the Threat, the Violence, and the Terrorism by i:man Lester-Everett. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Denial of Corporate Status and Corporate Capacity by i:man Lester-Everett. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by i:man Lester-Everett.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Burton E. Greenwood, Jr, Dorothy W. Greenwood, filed by i:man Lester-Everett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Attachment List of Questions to Ask in Selecting a Jury, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Cover Letter, #9 Envelope)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester-Everett v. Greenwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burton E. Greenwood, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy W. Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: i:man Lester-Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?