Smith-Bey v. Warden
Plaintiff: Germaine Smith-Bey
Defendant: Warden, .
Case Number: 1:2019cv02375
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting the Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order is signed to file a complaint as directed and to pay the filing fee or submit a Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/8/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m-Plaintiff)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary or Permanent Injunction or MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Germaine Smith-Bey (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Support for Permanant Injunction, #2 Attachments)(jb5, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/20/2019 (jb5, Deputy Clerk).
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE re #2 -Order, filed by Germaine Smith-Bey.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days from the date of this Order to file a complaint and pay the filing fee or submit a Motion for Leave To Proceed in Forma Pauperis; clerk shall send a copy of this order and a 1983 packet to Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 9/4/2019. (jb5, Deputy Clerk)(c/m and packet to Plaintiff-09-04-2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Warden, filed by Germaine Smith-Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith-Bey v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germaine Smith-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden, .
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?