Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02416
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 10/18/2019. (daws, Chambers)
October 10, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 10/10/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/30/2020. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/10/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/10/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.5(Rice, Heather)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide General Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Scottsdale Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Farmland Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Victoria Insurance Company, Other Affiliate AMCO Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Nationwide Affinity Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Depositors Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Titan Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Harleysville Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Insurance Company for Nationwide General Insurance Company.(Matzye, Jennifer)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Bill of Costs, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Fluidmaster, Inc. was filed using the incorrect events. **Please refile document under the "Other Documents" category, select the "Local Rule" event and add the specific rule when prompted. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENTS) BILL OF COSTS by Fluidmaster, Inc., Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fluidmaster, Inc. (Rice, Heather) Modified on 9/5/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Miscellaneous Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Fluidmaster, Inc..(Rice, Heather)
August 22, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to Fluidmaster, Inc. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Fluidmaster, Inc., filed by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Fluidmaster, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing of Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Rice, Heather)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Fluidmaster, Inc. (Rice, Heather)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, case number C-12-CV-19-000771. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8191882), filed by Fluidmaster, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Rice, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide General Insurance Company v. Fluidmaster, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluidmaster, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen J Marshall
Represented By: Heather Ann Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide General Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer L Matzye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?