Cullum v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Eugene A. Cullum, Jr.
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States of America, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA and United States Attorney General
Case Number: 1:2019cv02419
Filed: August 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States Attorney General, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr (Lanasa, Francis)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr (Lanasa, Francis)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. was filed incorrectly. Additional summons is needed. Whenever The United States or an agency of The United States is named as a Defendant a proposed summons is required for The Attorney General and the U.S Attorney for the District of Maryland. Please submit a summons for The U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/9/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/25/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/6/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr re #1 Complaint Summons (Murtha, Joseph)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 8/22/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Eugene A. Cullum, Jr or counsel for Eugene A. Cullum, Jr are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/5/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. was filed incorrectly.***The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8191553.), filed by Eugene A. Cullum, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Murtha, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullum v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene A. Cullum, Jr.
Represented By: Francis Christopher Lanasa
Represented By: Joseph Murtha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?