Taft et al v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Taft and Craig Taft
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02425
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated LIstings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for October 23, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re (1772 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION for Other Relief to Amend and Certify for Interlocutory Review the Court's Order Addressing Dismissal of Claims in the THA Track filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/8/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 34. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2020.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Other Relief for Entry of Case Management Order No. 15 (Pretrial Scheduling Order for BHR Track Cases) by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/25/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 37. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/21/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/31/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/30/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER confirming the results of the status conference on 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Yezierski on behalf of Cheryl Asher, James Asher, Henry Butler, Virginia Butler, Richard Linkiewicz, Wilma Tate, David M Allen, Kelli Coleman, Frank Hitselberger, Michelle Hitselberger, Carie Bowman, Craig Taft, Pamela Taft Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Yezierski, Matthew)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Listing), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Listing))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for September 25, 2019 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated BHR and THA Track Listings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit Ex. B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct (780 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) Case Management Order, Proposed Second Revised CMO1 by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Revised CMO1)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/11/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474. Total number of pages filed: 38. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Pamela Taft, Craig Taft. Smith & Nephew, Inc. waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019.(Rojas, Rachal)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8/21/19, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 15. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2019.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8193069.), filed by Pamela Taft, Craig Taft. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rojas, Rachal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taft et al v. Smith & Nephew , Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Taft
Represented By: Rachal G Rojas
Represented By: Matthew Yezierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Taft
Represented By: Rachal G Rojas
Represented By: Matthew Yezierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?