Phillips v. Maryland Board of Law Examiners et al
Plaintiff: Solon Phillips
Defendant: Matthew Mills, David Ralph, Jonathan Azrael, John Mudd and Maryland Board of Law Examiners
Case Number: 1:2019cv02427
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/19/2019. (c/m DS 9/19/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 9 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Maryland Board of Law Examiners, Jonathan Azrael, John Mudd, David Ralph, Matthew Mills must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M Cox on behalf of All Defendants (Cox, Kevin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jonathan Azrael, Maryland Board of Law Examiners, Matthew Mills, John Mudd, David Ralph, filed by Solon Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-19)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Take Judicial Notice for failure to comply with ECF 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/11/2019. (Chambers) (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/11/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/11/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Solon Phillips or counsel for Solon Phillips are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/25/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 [STRICKEN per 6 Paperless Order] MOTION to Take Judicial Notice of Solon Phillips' Forensic Report by Solon Phillips (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(krs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/11/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Solon Phillips. Jonathan Azrael waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Maryland Board of Law Examiners waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; Matthew Mills waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; John Mudd waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019; David Ralph waiver sent on 8/28/2019, answer due 10/28/2019.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan Azrael, Maryland Board of Law Examiners, Matthew Mills, John Mudd, David Ralph ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 84637034885.), filed by Solon Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ybs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Maryland Board of Law Examiners et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Mills
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Ralph
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Azrael
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mudd
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Board of Law Examiners
Represented By: Kevin M Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?