MKB Investments Corporation v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Plaintiff: MKB Investments Corporation
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02428
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER permitting additional time for counsel to reactivate membership or for plaintiff to find new counsel. Further Status Report is due 11/1/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/30/2019. (c/m 9/30/19) (krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Counsel to file a status report by 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/13/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m 08/23/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY, MARYLAND. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company.(ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, filed by MKB Investments Corporation. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank.(Heidelbach, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank.(Heidelbach, James)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-19-001858. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8193211), filed by Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Heidelbach, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MKB Investments Corporation v. Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Company, a/k/a M&T Bank
Represented By: James T Heidelbach
Represented By: Keith Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Represented By: James T Heidelbach
Represented By: Keith Michael Lusby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MKB Investments Corporation
Represented By: Robert C Kostecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?