Great Northern Insurance Company v. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. et al
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Defendant: Baltimore Gas & Electric Co., Aclara Technologies, LLC and Baltimore Gas & Electric Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02429
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company identifying Other Affiliate Exelon Corporation for Baltimore Gas & Electric Company.(Foltin, Jason)
October 11, 2019 Filing 24 QC NOTICE: #23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company was filed incorrectly. ***Please enter corporate parent/affiliate,Exelon Corporation when prompted. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 10, 2019 Filing 23 (FILED IN ERROR)Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company (Foltin, Jason) Modified on 10/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
October 9, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 20 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company must correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings &Other Documents &25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company or counsel for Baltimore Gas & Electric Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil & Other Filings & Other Documents & 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/17/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Baltimore Gas & Electric Company.(Foltin, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER: In response to ECF 16 the request to file a motion to dismiss is Denied at this time. The time for Defendant Aclara to file a responsive pleading is extended 30 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 10/3/2019. (Chambers)
October 2, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence re: requesting Aclara Technologies to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiff Great Northern Insurance Co.'s Amended Complaint (Barnes, Richard)
September 17, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Great Northern Insurance Company.(Luccaro, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to comply with ECF 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 9/17/2019. (Chambers)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimMotion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Aclara Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barnes, Richard)
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M Barnes on behalf of Aclara Technologies, LLC (Barnes, Richard)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel J Luccaro. Attorney Daniel J Luccaro will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019.(Stravitz, Eric)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel J. Luccaro (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8213608.) by Great Northern Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great Northern Insurance Company. Aclara Technologies, LLC served on 8/26/2019, answer due 9/16/2019.(Stravitz, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/23/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Great Northern Insurance Company or counsel for Great Northern Insurance Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/6/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aclara Technologies, LLC, Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Aclara Technologies, LLC, Baltimore Gas & Electric Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8193263.), filed by Great Northern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Stravitz, Eric)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Great Northern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Federal Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc. for Great Northern Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great Northern Insurance Company v. Baltimore Gas & Electric Company. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Gas & Electric Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aclara Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Richard M Barnes
Represented By: Derek McIntosh Stikeleather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Jason Robert Foltin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Represented By: Daniel J Luccaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?