Kearney v. USA
Plaintiff: Albert Kearney
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02537
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Albert Kearney ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 10/10/2019. (c/m 10/10/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Albert Kearney (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter)(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing Kearney to pay the $400 filing fee or submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within 28 days. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 9/25/2019. (c/m and form 9/25/19)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Motion for Return of Property) against USA filed by Albert Kearney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Motion, #4 Envelope) (hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kearney v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?