Green Mountain Capital LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Capital LLC
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv02603
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A Scotti on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Scotti, Brian)
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel re: Transfer of Case (c/emailed 09/09/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04628. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 TRANSFERRED to the District of Maryland the electronic record. (sxb, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Defendant's unopposed motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) is granted #16 , and this case is hereby transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. The Court grants Defendant 14 days from the date the case is opened by the transferee court to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's complaint. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Nicholas J. Daly for presentment of motion to transfer case #16 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Daly, Nicholas)
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Federal Insurance Company to transfer case to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland (Unopposed) (Daly, Nicholas)
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Insurance Company by Nicholas J. Daly (Daly, Nicholas)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Certification MIDPP by Green Mountain Capital LLC (Kuhn, Kevin)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time until 9/6/19 to answer the complaint #11 is granted. The status hearing set for 9/4/19 is reset to 9/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Sarah Rose Riedl for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #11 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 8/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Riedl, Sarah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Federal Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer (Riedl, Sarah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Insurance Company by Sarah Rose Riedl (Riedl, Sarah)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Insurance Company by Svetlana Gitman (Gitman, Svetlana)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Federal Insurance Company by Scott L. Schmookler (Schmookler, Scott)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 9/4/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Kuhn, Kevin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Plaintiff is advised that a Local Rule 3.2 Notification is required to be filed with the complaint. The Court orders Plaintiff to file a Local Rule 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates within 5 days. The Court also requests that Plaintiff include the place of domicile of Plaintiff's LLC members. Mailed notice (ca, )
July 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Green Mountain Capital LLC by Kevin J. Kuhn (Kuhn, Kevin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kuhn, Kevin)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Green Mountain Capital LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16012660. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Policy Exhibit)(Kuhn, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Mountain Capital LLC v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian A Scotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Mountain Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?