Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc. v. Pandora Jewelry LLC
Plaintiff: Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc.
Defendant: Pandora Jewelry LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02631
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence from Clerk to Plaintiff's Counsel re: Transfer of Case (c/emailed 09/11/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Michigan Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-10565. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of Maryland. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (DPer)
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Transfer Case by All Parties. (SPin)
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc. re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens (Lannen, Patrick)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to #4 MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Pandora Jewelry LLC. Response due by 8/22/2019. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc. (Lannen, Patrick)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF HEARING on #4 MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2019 at 2:00 PM before District Judge David M. Lawson in a Courtroom to be Determined. (SPin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Transfer Case for Improper Venue or, In the Alternative, Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Pandora Jewelry LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Yeatman, Jeffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Pandora Jewelry LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. (Lannen, Patrick)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued for *Pandora Jewelry LLC* (DPer)
February 25, 2019 A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DPer)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc. against Pandora Jewelry LLC. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7121885 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County, MI - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County, MI - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Terms and Conditions of Service) (Lannen, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc. v. Pandora Jewelry LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell A. Farrow (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pandora Jewelry LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey M Yeatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?