Baugh v. Ridge Tool Company et al
Plaintiff: Charles Baugh
Defendant: Ridge Tool Company and Bench Dog Tools Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02668
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Bench Dog Tools Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Rockler Companies, Inc. for Bench Dog Tools Inc..(O Toole, Jeffrey)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bench Dog Tools Inc..(O Toole, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Consent Motion for Leave to Late File Their Response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/30/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Ridge Tool Company or counsel for Ridge Tool Company are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/13/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ridge Tool Company identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Co. for Ridge Tool Company.(Corchiarino, Christopher)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ridge Tool Company.(Corchiarino, Christopher)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Bench Dog Tools Inc. or counsel for Bench Dog Tools Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/8/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Bench Dog Tools Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(O Toole, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Thomas Anderson on behalf of Charles Baugh (Anderson, Peter)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR-incorrect event, was re-filed as ECF#7) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Browne, Justin) Modified on 9/13/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Bench Dog Tools Inc., Ridge Tool Company.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 9/12/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Charles Baugh or counsel for Charles Baugh are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/26/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Charles Baugh re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Browne, Justin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8228980.), filed by Charles Baugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Browne, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baugh v. Ridge Tool Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ridge Tool Company
Represented By: Christopher M Corchiarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bench Dog Tools Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Brian O Toole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Baugh
Represented By: Justin Anthony Browne
Represented By: Peter Thomas Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?