Doe v. Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, P.A., M.D. Walter Gianelle, CHESAPEAKE MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC and Walter Gianelle
Case Number: 1:2019cv02670
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Janofsky, Julie)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence re: Certificate of Qualifed Expert (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Qualified Expert)(Cockey, Robin)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/15/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Jane Doe(Warshaw, Michael)
October 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment by Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC, Chesapeake Medical Solutions, P.A., Walter Gianelle (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Cockey, Robin)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym filed by Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC, Chesapeake Medical Solutions, P.A., Walter Gianelle. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cockey, Robin)
September 19, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Judge Catherine C. Blake no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued 21 days as to Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC, Chesapeake Medical Solutions, P.A., Walter Gianelle.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 9/17/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC.(Cockey, Robin)
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint Summons to Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC (Janofsky, Julie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint Summons to Chesapeake Medical Solutions, P.A. (Janofsky, Julie)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Jane Doe re #1 Complaint Summons to Walter Gianelle (Janofsky, Julie)
September 12, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Jane Doe(bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Jane Doe was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 -[ISSUED IN ERROR]- QC NOTICE: #2 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Jane Doe was filed incorrectly. **. Please re-file using the event > Motions and Related Filings > Motions > Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/13/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym, Memorandum in Support, proposed Order served on All Defendants via Robin R. Cockey, attorney for Defendants on 09/12/2019, filed by Jane Doe.(Janofsky, Julie)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Janofsky, Julie) Modified on 9/13/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 9/13/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8229452.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Janofsky, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Chesapeake Medical Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, P.A.
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Walter Gianelle
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Gianelle
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Michael Stuart Warshaw
Represented By: Julie C Janofsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?