Allstate Insurance Company v. Spectrum brands, Inc.
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: spectrum brands
Case Number: 1:2019cv02779
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re: Consent form due date. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to counsel concerning discovery)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #19 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/6/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for All Proceedings. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/6/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Andersen, James)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 QC NOTICE: #16 Certificate of Service filed by Allstate Insurance Company was filed incorrectly.***Discovery should not be filed with the Court. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 (FILED IN ERROR)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Allstate Insurance Company Discovery Requests to Defendant (Fratus, Charles) Modified on 11/6/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
October 29, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 10/29/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 4/27/2020. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/29/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Spectrum Brands, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Spectrum Brands Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Spectrum Brands, Inc. for Spectrum Brands, Inc..(Andersen, James)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 MISCELLANEOUS Correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss the attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Weiss. Directing attorney James Weiss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 10/1/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
September 30, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to Spectrum Brands, Inc. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 10/7/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Spectrum Brands, Inc..(Andersen, James)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Weiss by Spectrum Brands, Inc.. The fee has already been paid.(Andersen, James)
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Spectrum Brands, Inc. needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James Weiss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8257715.) by Spectrum Brands, Inc.(Andersen, James)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Spectrum Brands, Inc. was filed incorrectly. Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure should be filed as a separate document. ***Please re-file the document by selecting Other Filings> Other Documents> Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. **Please enter corporate parent/affiliate(s) when prompted. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Spectrum Brands, Inc. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/23/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County Docket Sheet (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Spectrum Brands, Inc. served on 8/28/2019.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 30 days as to Spectrum Brands, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Spectrum Brands, Inc., filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Anne Arundel County, case number C-02-CV-19-002635. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8245867), filed by Spectrum brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Disclosure of Corporate Interest, #4 Exhibit Circuit Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit Circuit Court Docket, #6 Exhibit Circuit Court Notice of Removal)(Andersen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Spectrum brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: spectrum brands
Represented By: James Richard Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Charles J Fratus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?