Lewis v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darien Lewis
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: SSA Notify
Case Number: 1:2019cv02843
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darien Lewis. Andrew Saul served on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ol, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/1/2019. (c/m 10/01/2019 ol, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 10/1/2019 (ol, Deputy Clerk).
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew Saul (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darien Lewis (ol, Deputy Clerk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Darien Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (ol, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darien Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Notify
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?