Jordon v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary Linnelle Jordon
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv02895
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/13/2019 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Linnelle Jordon. Andrew Saul served on 10/9/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Commissioner summons exec w proof of service, #2 US Atty Gen Summons exec w proof of service)(Fyock, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued 60 days as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Appearance and Consent to Magistrate Judge by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of Andrew Saul (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Paperless order referring case to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for pretrial management and report and recommendations pursuant to Standing Order 2014-01. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/2/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mary Linnelle Jordon(Fyock, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mary Linnelle Jordon against Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Mary Linnelle Jordon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Fyock, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordon v. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Linnelle Jordon
Represented By: Matthew D Fyock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?