Nwoga v. Karceski et al
Plaintiff: Susan Nwoga
Defendant: Richard Karceski, Law Firm of Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White and Howard Schulman Wright, Constable & Skeen, LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv02899
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/22/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 11.25.19)
November 22, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/22/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(C/M 11.25.19)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Correspondence from Susan Nwoga re: Request for federal jury trial not a Baltimore City jury trial. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Cover Letter)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RETURN DOCUMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Returned Document)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Susan Nwoga(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Howard Schulman Wright, Constable & Skeen, LLP, Richard Karceski, Law Firm of Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White, filed by Susan Nwoga. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Attachment)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nwoga v. Karceski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Karceski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm of Silverman, Thompson, Slutkin & White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Schulman Wright, Constable & Skeen, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Nwoga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?