Tang v. Schmoke et al
Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Defendant: Christy Lee Koontz, Darlene Brannigan Smith, Kathleen Anderson, Roger E. Hartley, Kurt L. Schmoke, Patria de Lancer Julnes and Joseph S. Wood
Case Number: 1:2019cv02965
Filed: October 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983vp
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kathleen Anderson, Roger E. Hartley, Patria de Lancer Julnes, Christy Lee Koontz, Kurt L. Schmoke, Darlene Brannigan Smith, Joseph S. Wood.(dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/15/19-das)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing Clerk to issue summons. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/14/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 11/15/19-das)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 RESPONSE to #2 Order to Show Cause filed by Hong Tang.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 10/21/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 10/21/19-das)
October 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Anderson, Roger E. Hartley, Patria de Lancer Julnes, Christy Lee Koontz, Kurt L. Schmoke, Darlene Brannigan Smith, Joseph S. Wood, filed by Hong Tang. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637118619) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(dass, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. Schmoke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christy Lee Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Brannigan Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger E. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt L. Schmoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patria de Lancer Julnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph S. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hong Tang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?