Iwebo v. Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Iwebo
Defendant: Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03008
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/5/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 11/5/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Jane Iwebo to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 11/22/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Jane Iwebo files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/31/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 11/4/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Iwebo. Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/23/2019.(Rose, George)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 10/16/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Jane Iwebo or counsel for Jane Iwebo are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 10/30/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8293172.), filed by Jane Iwebo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rose, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iwebo v. Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Iwebo
Represented By: George A Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheppard Pratt Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce S Harrison
Represented By: Alexander Ivan Castelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?