Collins v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv03058
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 11/22/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Return of Property by United States of America(Gould, Ilissa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ilissa M Gould on behalf of United States of America (Gould, Ilissa)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Notice of Appearance filed by United States of America was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect case number on document. Please refile using proper civil action number JKB-19-3058. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 [FILED IN ERROR] NOTICE of Appearance by Ilissa M Gould on behalf of United States of America (Gould, Ilissa) Modified on 11/19/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the United States of America to respond to Plaintiff's Petition on or before 11/21/2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/21/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria Christina Hamilton on behalf of Michael Collins (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America filed by Michael Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Collins
Represented By: Maria Christina Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Ilissa M Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?