Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund et al v. Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the International Training Fund and Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund
Defendant: Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03165
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Capitol Refrigeration, Inc. answer due 1/27/2020. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/16/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Szewczyk, Jacob)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund. Capitol Refrigeration, Inc. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019.(Szewczyk, Jacob)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kelser on behalf of M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kelser, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to All Defendants. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund (Szewczyk, Jacob)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capitol Refrigeration, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8321996.), filed by Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund, Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund, Steamfitters Local Union No. 602, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund, Trustees of the International Training Fund, M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund, Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund, Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Certificate of Service)(Szewczyk, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund et al v. Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Steamfitters Local 602 Retirement Savings Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Training Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Local 602 Communications and Productivity Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Eddie Moore Scholarship Trust Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Medical Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Heating, Piping and Refrigeration Pension Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steamfitters Local Union No. 602
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Training Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Industry Promotion Fund
Represented By: Jacob Nicholas Szewczyk
Represented By: Andrew Kelser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?