S.S. v. Board of Education of Harford County et al
Plaintiff: M.S., S.S. and T.S.
Defendant: Sean Bulson and Board of Education of Harford County
Case Number: 1:2019cv03168
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 23 Substantive legal issues - addressing (Steedman, Cheryl)
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 Correspondence re: Discovery Dispute (Attachments: #1 Attachment Medical Report, #2 Attachment Medical Report, #3 Attachment Medical Report)(Nussbaum, Andrew)
December 26, 2019 Filing 20 Joint Request for Conference (Steedman, Cheryl)
December 17, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM to Counsel Concerning Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/17/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Discovery. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/17/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 [FILED SEPARATELY] NOTICE of filing Administrative Record (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 17 Correspondence re: Initial Report in Response to Scheduling Order (Steedman, Cheryl)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Board of Education of Harford County, Sean Bulson re #10 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Nussbaum, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Notice of Removal)(Nussbaum, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 Correspondence from Margaret J. Pane Tufano, Esq. re: applying for admission to the bar (krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/18/2020. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 11/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Informal Discovery Letter)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
November 3, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Board of Education of Harford County, Sean Bulson.(Nussbaum, Andrew)
November 3, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Board of Education of Harford County, Sean Bulson (Nussbaum, Andrew)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 10/31/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence from Clerk to Counsel re: Removal Notification Letter(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-8) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR HARFORD COUNTY. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence from Cheryl Steedman re: Redacted Complaint(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Sean Bulson.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence from Wayne Steedman re: Request to Issue Summons(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret J. Pane Tufano on behalf of M.S., S.S., T.S. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cheryl Athene Steele Steedman on behalf of M.S., S.S., T.S. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Darryl Steedman on behalf of M.S., S.S., T.S. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Board of Education of Harford County, Sean Bulson, filed by T.S., M.S., S.S.. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, case number C-12-CV-19-000977. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8322163), filed by Board of Education of Harford County, Sean Bulson. (Attachments: #1 Summons Writ of Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Case Information Report, #3 Complaint, #4 Entry of Appearance, #5 Entry of Appearance, #6 Entry of Appearance, #7 Request to Issue Summons, #8 Correspondence to Court)(Nussbaum, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.S. v. Board of Education of Harford County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.S.
Represented By: Wayne Darryl Steedman
Represented By: Cheryl Athene Steele Steedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S.S.
Represented By: Wayne Darryl Steedman
Represented By: Cheryl Athene Steele Steedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.S.
Represented By: Wayne Darryl Steedman
Represented By: Cheryl Athene Steele Steedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Bulson
Represented By: Andrew W Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Harford County
Represented By: Andrew W Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?