Dorsey v. Oluwabiyi
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Dorsey
Defendant: Solomon Oluwabiyi
Case Number: 1:2019cv03189
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Gregory S. Dorsey(bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement as to Gregory S. Dorsey. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Gregory S. Dorsey ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 12/3/2019. (c/m 12/03/2019 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing the Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet for the past six months of Plaintiffs incarceration. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/6/2019. (c/m 11/6/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gregory S. Dorsey(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Solomon Oluwabiyi, filed by Gregory S. Dorsey.(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. Oluwabiyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solomon Oluwabiyi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?