Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund et al v. Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Medical Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Severance and Anniuty/401(k) Fund, International Training Fund, Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc., Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund and Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Joint Journeyman and Apprentice Training Fund
Defendant: Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03190
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah L. Boardman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc., Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Medical Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Joint Journeyman and Apprentice Training Fund, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Severance and Anniuty/401(k) Fund. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Barnaskas, Shauna)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 11/13/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Boardman. International Training Fund, Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc., et al are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/27/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Capitol Refrigeration, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by International Training Fund, Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc., Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Joint Journeyman and Apprentice Training Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Medical Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Severance and Anniuty/401(k) Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO (Barnaskas, Shauna)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capitol Refrigeration, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8328481.), filed by Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc., Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Medical Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Joint Journeyman and Apprentice Training Fund, International Training Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Severance and Anniuty/401(k) Fund. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Summons)(Barnaskas, Shauna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund et al v. Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Medical Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486, United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Severance and Anniuty/401(k) Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Training Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mechanical Contractors Association of Maryland, Inc.
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Pension Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Steamfitters Local 486 Joint Journeyman and Apprentice Training Fund
Represented By: Shauna Marie Barnaskas
Represented By: Kimberly Lynn Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capitol Refrigeration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?