Buckmaster v. The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Plaintiff: Keith Buckmaster
Defendant: National Passenger Railroad Corporation ("Amtrak") and The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv03203
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12111
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher A Macey, Jr. Directing attorney Christopher A Macey, Jr to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jennifer Calabrese Bell. Directing attorney Jennifer Calabrese Bell to use the attorney's existing CM/ECF login and password previously issued in this Court. The account password can be reset at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-password-reset. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James A Bell. Directing attorney James A Bell to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 12/13/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher A. Macey, Jr. (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8402735.) by Keith Buckmaster(Keating, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer C. Bell (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8402733.) by Keith Buckmaster(Keating, Mary)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James A. Bell, IV (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8402732.) by Keith Buckmaster(Keating, Mary)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 12/6/2019. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea M. Smialek on behalf of The National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Smialek, Chelsea)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by The National Railroad Passenger Corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Alison)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to The National Railroad Passenger Corporation. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keith Buckmaster ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8331855.), filed by Keith Buckmaster. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Keating, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckmaster v. The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Buckmaster
Represented By: Mary T Keating
Represented By: Jennifer Calabrese Bell
Represented By: James A Bell
Represented By: Christopher A Macey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Passenger Railroad Corporation ("Amtrak")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Railroad Passenger Corporation
Represented By: Chelsea M. Smialek
Represented By: Alison N Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?